A | B | C |
D | E | F |
G | H | I |
J | K | L |
M | N | O |
P | Q | R |
S | T | U |
V | W | X |
Y | Z
N
|
AREA / Name |
Period of Service |
| |
NATCHEZ NATIONAL HISTORICAL PARK, MISSISSIPPI 1
(Authorized 10/07/1988) |
|
Administered by Supt., Natchez Trace Parkway | 10/07/1988 | - |
1 Authorized by PL 100-479, 102 Stat. 2324, 10/07/1988.
|
|
NATCHEZ TRACE PARKWAY, MISSISSIPPI-TENNESSEE-ALABAMA
(Established 5/18/1938) |
|
Randle B. Truett, Act'g. Rep. in Charge | 4/01/1938 | - | 8/28/1938 |
Malcolm E. Gardner, Act'g. Supt. 1 | 8/29/1938 | - | 6/30/1942 |
Malcolm E. Gardner, Supt. 2 | 7/01/1942 | - | 3/11/1967 |
Joseph C. Rumburg, Jr., Supt. | 4/09/1967 | - | 9/21/1968 |
Robert C. Haraden, Supt. 3 | 9/22/1968 | - | 1/22/1972 |
Bruce W. Black, Act'g. Supt. | 1/23/1972 | - | 5/13/1972 |
Carroll W. Ogle, Supt. | 5/14/1972 | - | 10/04/1980 |
James L. Bainbridge, Supt. 4 | 10/05/1980 | - | 11/30/1990 |
Don R. Thompson, Act'g Supt. | 12/01/1990 | - | 5/04/1991 |
Daniel W. Brown, Supt. | 5/05/1991 | - |
1 Administered Ackia Battleground NM from 10/25/1938 to 8/10/1961. Administers Brices Crossroads NMS & Tupelo NM from 7/1941.
2 Administered Meriwether Lewis NM from 2/28/1953 to 8/10/1961 when it was integrated into Natchez Trace Parkway.
3 Assigned line authority for Natchez Trace Management group including Shiloh and Vicksburg NMPs, Stones River NB and Cem., and Chalmette NHP (now Jean Lafitte NHP and Pres in SW Region). Vicksburg NMP managed separately from 1972; Stones River and Shiloh NMPs managed separately from 1976; Chalmette NHP managed separately from 11/14/1971.
4 Administers Natchez NHP from 10/07/1988.
|
|
NATIONAL CAPITAL PARKS-CENTRAL 1
|
|
Lawrence C. Hadley, Supt. | 5/24/1965 | - | 1/15/1966 |
Monte E. Fitch, Supt. | 1/16/1966 | - | 6/15/1968 |
William R. Failor, Supt. | 6/16/1968 | - | 8/19/1972 |
Luther C. Burnett, Supt. 2 | 8/20/1972 | - | 2/27/1977 |
Roger Sulcer, Supt. | 10/01/1977 | - | 1/11/1980 |
William F. Ruback, Supt. | 3/23/1980 | - | 5/06/1989 |
Arnold M. Goldstein, Act'g Supt. | 5/07/1989 | - | 7/01/1989 |
Arnold M. Goldstein, Supt. | 7/02/1989 | - |
1 Includes the Mall, Lincoln Memorial, Jefferson Memorial, Washington Monument, Ford's Theatre, White House, House Where Lincoln Died, Pennsylvania Avenue NHS, D.C., Bethune Council House, Vietman Veterans Memorial in Constitution Gardens, Fifty-Six Signers of the Declaration of Independence, Pennsylvania Avenue Development Corporation, and Maine Lobsterman Memorial.
2 Park was known as National Capital Parks-West during this period.
|
|
NATIONAL CAPITAL PARKS-EAST 1
|
|
Grover Earl Steele, Supt. | 5/24/1965 | - | 7/31/1970 |
Robert G. Stanton, Supt. | 8/23/1970 | - | 8/22/1971 |
Abner M. Bradley, Supt. | 8/27/1971 | - | 12/22/1973 |
Ira J. Hutchison, Supt. | 12/23/1973 | - | 4/09/1977 |
Terrie R. Savering, Act'g. Supt. | 4/10/1977 | - | 8/15/1977 |
Dorothy T. Benton, Act'g. Supt. | 8/16/1977 | - | 9/15/1977 |
Robert S. McDaniel, Act'g. Supt. | 9/16/1977 | - | 10/15/1977 |
Burnice T. Kearney, Act'g. Supt. | 10/16/1977 | - | 12/15/1977 |
Eugene Colbert, Supt. | 2/12/1978 | - | 1/15/1979 |
Burnice T. Kearney, Act'g. Supt. | 1/16/1979 | - | 6/09/1979 |
Burnice T. Kearney, Supt. | 6/10/1979 | - | 11/04/1989 |
Terry R. Savering, Act'g Supt. | 11/05/1989 | - | 2/24/1989 |
Gentry Davis, Supt. | 2/25/1990 | - |
1 Includes Ft. Washington, Frederick Douglass Home, Piscataway Park, Oxon Hill Children's Fair, Kenilworth Gardens, Suitland Parkway, Anacostia Park, and the Fort Circle Parks from Fort Mahan to Fort Stanton, Lincoln to Fort Greble, Sewall-Belmont House, Capitol Hill Parks and Harmony Hall.
|
|
NATIONAL CAPITAL PARKS-NORTH 1
|
|
Joseph Brown, Supt. | 5/24/1965 | - | 5/06/1967 |
J. A. Martinek, Supt. | 5/07/1967 | - | 5/29/1971 |
Joseph Antosca, Supt. | 9/05/1971 | - | 4/27/1972 |
1 Originally designated as National Capital-North in 1965 and included Rock Creek Park, Pierce Mill, the Old Stone House, and Fort Circle Parks from Fort Totten to Battery Kemble, Battleground National Cemetery, D.C., and others. During period 6/1972-3/1975, these areas were administered by National Capital Parks-West and East and George Washington Memorial Parkway. Name changed to Rock Creek Park on 3/16/1975.
|
|
NATIONAL MALL, WASHINGTON, D.C.
(Established 7/16/1980) |
|
Administered by National Capital Parks-Central |
|
NATIONAL TRAILS PROJECT OFFICE, MADISON, WISCONSIN 1
|
(Established 1/14/1990) |
|
Manager, Thomas L. Gilbert | 1/14/1990 | - |
1 Established administratively with the appointment of Thomas L. Gilbert as Manager of Ice Age National Scenic Trail. Mr. Gilbert's duty station was changed from the Regional Office in Omaha, Nebraska to Madison, Wisconsin, relocating April 16, 1990. The National Trails Project Office administers the Lewis and Clark National Historic Trail, and the North Country National Scenic Trail in addition to the Ice Age National Scenic Trail.
|
|
NATIONAL VISITOR CENTER, WASHINGTON, D.C.
(Established 3/12/1968, returned to Washington Terminal Company 5/18/1981) |
|
James C. Gross, General Manager | 7/25/1973 | - | 1/13/1979 |
Georgia A. Ellard, Gen. Manager | 1/14/1979 | - | 5/17/1981 |
|
NATURAL BRIDGES NATIONAL MONUMENT, UTAH
(Established 4/16/1908) |
|
Zeke Johnson, Cust. | 2/28/1923 | - | 4/30/1941 |
Administered by Supt., Arches NM | 5/01/1941 | - | 10/25/1964 |
Administered by Supt., Canyonlands NP | 10/25/1964 | - |
|
NAVAJO LANDS GROUP, ARIZONA 1
(Established 2/28/1968) |
|
John E. Cook, Gen. Supt. | 2/11/1968 | - | 1/09/1971 |
Arthur H. White, Gen. Supt. | 1/10/1971 | - | 1/09/1982 |
Charles B. Voll, Gen. Supt. | 1/10/1982 | - | 9/30/1982 |
1 Includes Aztec Ruins, after 1/10/1971, Canyon de Chelly, Chaco Canyon, El Morro, Navajo and Sunset Crater and Wupatki NM's after 10/31/1971, and Hubbell Trading Post NHS. Navajo Lands Group Headquarters office located in Chinle, AZ from 2/11/1968 to 1/09/1971 and Farmington, NM from 1/10/1971 to 9/30/1982.
|
|
NAVAJO NATIONAL MONUMENT, ARIZONA
(Established 3/20/1909) |
|
John Wetherill, Cust. 1 | 4/09/1909 | - | 12/31/1938 |
James W. Brewer, Jr., Cust. | 6/01/1939 | - | 3/31/1943 |
William W. Wilson, Act'g. Cust. | 4/01/1943 | - | 1/18/1943 |
James W. Brewer, Jr., Cust. | 1/19/1946 | - | 6/23/1950 |
John A. Aubuchon, Supt. | 6/24/1950 | - | 11/28/1953 |
Foy L. Young, Supt. | 12/03/1953 | - | 4/07/1956 |
Arthur H. White, Supt. | 4/08/1956 | - | 3/14/1965 |
Jack R. Williams, Supt. 2 | 5/09/1965 | - | 10/19/1968 |
William G. Binnewies, Supt. | 11/17/1968 | - | 6/24/1972 |
Frank E. Hastings, Supt. | 6/25/1972 | - | 3/22/1980 |
Stephen T. Miller, Supt. | 9/15/1980 | - | 6/07/1986 |
Clarence N. Gorman, Supt. | 6/08/1986 | - | |
1 Administered Rainbow Bridge NM from 5/30/10 to 8/05/1964.
2 Administration supervised by Gen. Supt., Navajo Lands Group, from 2/28/1968.
|
|
NEWBERRY NATIONAL VOLCANIC MONUMENT, OREGON 1
(Established 11/5/1990) |
1 Established under PL 101-522 as a component of the National Forest System. Administered as a part of Deschutes National Forest.
|
|
NEW JERSEY COASTAL HERITAGE TRAIL ROUTE, NEW JERSEY
(Authorized 10/20/1988) |
|
Janet C. Wolf, Project Manager1 | 3/11/1990 | - |
1 Authorized by PL 100-515, October 20, 1988, Janet Wolf was detailed from the Superintendency of Morristown NHP on 2/19/1989 to an acting project manager position. This was made permanent on 3/11/1990.
|
|
NEW RIVER GORGE NATIONAL RIVER, WEST VIRGINIA
(Established 11/10/1978) |
|
James W. Carrico, Supt. | 9/23/1979 | - | 9/13/1986 |
Robert L. Whitman, Act'g. Supt. | 9/14/1986 | - | 1/31/1987 |
Joe L. Kennedy, Supt. 1 | 2/01/1987 | - | |
1 Administers Bluestone National Scenic River and Gauley River National Recreation Area from 10/26/1988.
|
|
NEW YORK CITY NATIONAL PARK SERVICE GROUP 1
(Established 1/14/1964) |
|
Newell H. Foster, Gen. Supt. | 1/14/1964 | - | 8/29/1964 |
John A. Townsley, Gen. Supt. 2 | 8/30/1964 | - | 2/11/1967 |
1 Includes Statue of Liberty (which includes Ellis Island) and Castle Clinton NMs; Federal Hall, Hamilton Grange, and General Grant NMes; and Theodore Roosevelt Birthplace and Sagamore Hill NHSs.
2 Administration combined with Fire Island NS 2/12/1967. Group included in New York District 12/26/1971 to 1/06/1974. New York District abolished and reduced to New York Group 1/06/1974 when North Atlantic Region was established 8/15/1976. New York Group abolished and Manhattan Sites established for Castle Clinton, Federal Hall, Hamilton Grange, General Grant and Theodore Roosevelt Birthplace.
|
|
NEW YORK GROUP 1
(Established 1/06/1974) |
|
William Hendrickson, Supt. 2 | 1/06/1974 | - | 8/15/1975 |
1 Group consisted of Statue of Liberty and Castle Clinton NMs, Federal Hall, General Grant and Hamilton Grange NMems and Theodore Roosevelt Birthplace and Sagamore Hill NHSs.
2 Group reorganized and succeeded by Manhattan Sites, Sagamore Hill NHS and Statue of Liberty and Ellis Island NMs.
|
|
NEZ PERCE NATIONAL HISTORICAL PARK, IDAHO
(Authorized 5/15/1965; Established 5/19/1970) |
|
Robert L. Burns, Supt. | 8/29/1965 | - | 9/08/1968 |
Jack R. Williams, Supt. | 10/20/1968 | - | 8/30/1975 |
Robert L. Morris, Supt. | 9/28/1975 | - | 12/27/1980 |
Fahy C. Whitaker, Supt. | 2/22/1981 | - | 1/03/1987 |
Roy W. Weaver, Supt. | 1/04/1987 | - | 7/14/1990 |
Susan J. Buchel, Act'g Supt. | 7/15/1990 | - | 9/08/1990 |
Frankin G. Walker, Supt. | 9/09/1990 | - | |
|
NINETY SIX NATIONAL HISTORIC SITE, SOUTH CAROLINA
(Authorized 8/19/1976; Established 2/01/1982) |
|
Robert S. Armstrong, Supt. | 1/29/1978 | - | 2/02/1985 |
William T. Springer, Acting Supt. | 2/03/1985 | - | 7/18/1987 |
Robert S. Armstrong, Supt. 1 | 7/19/1987 | - |
1 Administered Cowpens NBS from 7/19/1987.
|
|
NOATAK NATIONAL PRESERVE, ALASKA
(Established 12/01/1978) |
|
Administered by Superintendent, Kobuk Valley NP | 9/07/1980 | - | 7/26/1982 |
Administered By Supt., Northwest Alaska Areas | 7/27/1982 | - |
|
NORTH CASCADES NATIONAL PARK, WASHINGTON
(Established 10/02/1968) |
|
Roger J. Contor, Supt. 1 | 11/10/1968 | - | 1/09/1971 |
W. Lowell White, Supt. | 1/24/1971 | - | 9/09/1978 |
Keith E. Miller, Supt. | 9/10/1978 | - | 7/21/1984 |
John J. Reynolds, Supt. | 10/14/1984 | - | 9/24/1988 |
David A. Pugh, Act'g Supt. | 9/25/1988 | - | 10/08/1988 |
John R. Earnst, Supt. | 10/09/1988 | - |
1 Administered Lake Chelan & Ross Lake NRAs from 11/10/1968.
|
|
NORTH COUNTRY NATIONAL SCENIC TRAIL, NEW YORK TO NORTH DAKOTA 1
|
(Authorized 3/5/1980) |
|
Administered by National Trails Project Office | 1/14/1990 | - |
1 Established by PL 96-199, March 5, 1980, the North Country National Scenic Trail is approximately 3,200 miles long, extending from eastern New York State to the vicinity of Lake Sakakawea in North Dakota. Administered initially by the Midwest Regional Office, it was placed under the administration of the National Trails Project Office, Madison, Wisconsin, as of 1/14/1990.
|
|
NORTHWEST ALASKA AREAS, ALASKA 1
(Established 7/27/1982) |
|
Charles M. Shaver, Supt. | 7/27/1982 | - | 5/09/1987 |
Gilbert R. Hall, Act'g Supt. | 5/10/1987 | - | 8/01/1987 |
Alan D. Eliason, Supt. | 8/02/1987 | - | 6/02/1990 |
David D. Mills, Act'g Supt. | 6/03/1990 | - | 8/11/1990 |
Ralph H. Tingey, Supt. | 8/12/1990 | - |
1 Administers Cape Krusenstern NM, Kobuk Valley NP, and Noatak National Preserve.
|
|
N
A | B | C |
D | E | F |
G | H | I |
J | K | L |
M | N | O |
P | Q | R |
S | T | U |
V | W | X |
Y | Z
|