A | B | C |
D | E | F |
G | H | I |
J | K | L |
M | N | O |
P | Q | R |
S | T | U |
V | W | X |
Y | Z
J
|
AREA / Name |
Period of Service |
| |
JAMES A. GARFIELD NATIONAL HISTORIC SITE, OHIO
(Authorized 12/28/1980) |
|
Administered by Supt., Cuyahoga Valley National Recreation Area |
|
JAMESTOWN NATIONAL HISTORIC SITE, VIRGINIA
(Established 12/18/1940) |
|
Administered by Supt., Colonial National Historical Park |
|
JEAN LAFITTE NATIONAL HISTORICAL PARK, LOUISIANA 1
(Authorized 11/10/1978) |
|
Lionel Bienvenu, Act'g. Supt. | 11/10/1978 | - | 1/15/1979 |
James R. Isenogle, Supt. | 1/16/1979 | - | 8/29/1987 |
| Meredith A. Belkov, Supt. | 11/08/1987 | - | 12/15/1990 |
Steven D. Hickman, Act'g Supt. | 12/16/1990 | - | 2/09/1991 |
Robert Belous, Supt. | 2/10/1991 | - |
1 Chalmette NHP combined with Jean Lafitte NHP and Preserve on 11/10/1978.
|
|
JEFFERSON MEMORIAL, WASHINGTON, D.C.
(Authorized 6/26/1934; Dedicated 4/13/1943) |
|
Administered by National Capital Parks-Central |
|
JEFFERSON NATIONAL EXPANSION MEMORIAL NATIONAL HISTORIC SITE, MISSOURI
(Designated 12/21/1935; Established 5/17/1954) |
|
John L. Nagle, Supt. | 6/09/1936 | - | 11/04/1940 |
Julian C. Spotts, Supt. | 11/16/1940 | - | 1/09/1959 |
George B. Hartzog, Jr., Supt. | 2/01/1959 | - | 8/21/1962 |
H. Raymond Gregg, Supt. | 8/22/1962 | - | 6/19/1965 |
LeRoy R. Brown, Supt. | 8/01/1965 | - | 12/29/1968 |
Harry W. Pfanz, Supt. | 12/29/1968 | - | 1/09/1971 |
Ivan D. Parker, Supt. | 1/10/1971 | - | 2/16/1974 |
Robert S. Chandler, Supt. | 4/01/1975 | - | 12/30/1978 |
Jerry L. Schober, Supt. 1 | 2/11/1979 | - |
1 Superintendent Schober retired on 10/31/1990, and immediately returned as a reemployed annuitant.
|
|
JEWEL CAVE NATIONAL MONUMENT, SOUTH DAKOTA 1
(Authorized 2/07/1908) |
|
Administered by Supt., Wind Cave NP 2 | 8/10/1933 | - |
1 Transferred from U.S. Department of Agriculture 8/10/1969.
2 Administration supervised by Gen. Supt., Black Hills Areas from 5/05/1950 to 5/31/1954.
|
|
JIMMY CARTER NATIONAL HISTORIC SITE, GEORGIA
(Authorized 12/23/1987) |
|
Administered by Supt., Andersonville NHS | 2/13/1988 | - |
|
JOHN D. ROCKEFELLER, JR. MEMORIAL PARKWAY, WYOMING
(Established 8/25/1972) |
|
Administered by Grand Teton, NP | 8/25/1972 | - |
|
JOHN DAY FOSSIL BEDS NATIONAL MONUMENT, OREGON
(Authorized 10/26/1974; Established 10/08/1975) |
|
Benjamin F. Ladd, Supt. | 9/28/1975 | - |
|
JOHN F. KENNEDY CENTER FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, WASHINGTON, D.C.1
(Authorized 9/02/1958; Established 11/11/1972)
|
|
W. Douglas Lindsay, Jr., Site Manager | 11/12/1972 | - | 1/30/1974 |
Olaf R. Anderson, General Manager | 3/31/1974 | - | 6/02/1978 |
Emmons O. Larson, Jr., General Manager | 7/23/1978 | - | 8/13/1988 |
Joseph M. Lawler, General Manager | 8/14/1988 | - |
1 National Cultural Center authorized 9/02/1958. Renamed the John F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts and designated sole national memorial to the late President in the Nation's Capital on 1/23/1964. National Park Service assumed responsibility on 11/11/1972 for certain services necessary to nonperforming arts functions of this national memorial.
|
|
JOHN FITZGERALD KENNEDY NATIONAL HISTORIC SITE, MASSACHUSETTS 1
(Authorized 8/31/1964; established 5/26/1967) |
|
Administered by Supt., Longfellow National Historic Site |
1 Administered by Gen. Supt., Boston NPS Group, from 5/30/1970 to 2/18/1974. Administered by Supt. Longfellow NHS from 2/18/1974.
|
|
JOHNSTOWN FLOOD NATIONAL MEMORIAL, PENNSYLVANIA
(Authorized 8/31/1964; Established 6/30/1969) |
|
Administered by Allegheny Portage Railroad NHS | 2/28/1965 | - |
|
JOHN MUIR NATIONAL HISTORIC SITE, CALIFORNIA
(Authorized 8/31/1964) |
|
Paul E. Schulz, Supt. 1 | 1/06/1966 | - | 2/22/1969 |
John E. Jensen, Supt. | 4/20/1969 | - | 6/26/1971 |
Roger J. Siglin, Supt. | 8/22/1971 | - | 1/07/1973 |
Doris I.G. Omundson (Bowen), Supt. 2 | 1/21/1973 | - | 4/19/1980 |
Phyllis P. Shaw, Supt. | 6/01/1980 | - |
1 As a unit of the San Francisco Bay Area Group, administration supervised by Supt., Point Reyes NRA, from 7/01/1968 to 10/27/1972, and by the Bay Area General Superintendent from 10/28/1972 until 8/3/1974. On 8/4/1974, John Muir NHS was supervised by the north area superintendent, who was also the superintendent of Golden Gate NRA.
2 Effective 10/22/1977, through an organizational change which abolished the position of General Manager of Bay Area Parks, John Muir NHS was again administered as a separate park unit under the Regional Director, Western Region.
|
|
JOSHUA TREE NATIONAL MONUMENT, CALIFORNIA 1
(Established 8/10/1936) |
|
James E. Cole, Supt. | 9/09/1940 | - | 10/30/1942 |
Duane D. Jacobs, Supt. | 12/09/1942 | - | 3/26/1944 |
Frank R. Givens, Act'g. Cust. | 3/1937/1944 | - | 6/01/1944 |
James E. Cole, Cust. | 5/06/1944 | - | 3/01/1947 |
Frank R. Givens, Supt. | 3/02/1947 | - | 4/11/1953 |
Samuel A. King, Supt. | 4/12/1953 | - | 1/20/1957 |
Elmer N. Fladmark, Supt. | 2/24/1957 | - | 8/01/1958 |
William R. Supernaugh, Supt. | 10/05/1958 | - | 3/20/1971 |
Peter L. Parry, Supt. | 4/18/1971 | - | 7/07/1973 |
Homer L. Rouse, Supt. | 7/08/1973 | - | 8/14/1976 |
Frederick T. Anderson, Supt. | 8/16/1976 | - |
1 Administered by Supt., Yosemite NP until 9/1940.
|
|
JUAN BAUTISTA DE ANZA NATIONAL HISTORIC TRAIL, ARIZONA, CALIFORNIA
(Authorized August 15, 1990) |
|
Administered by Reg. Director, Western Region | 8/15/1990 | - |
|
J
A | B | C |
D | E | F |
G | H | I |
J | K | L |
M | N | O |
P | Q | R |
S | T | U |
V | W | X |
Y | Z
|